Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph William Cardinal Tobin, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Newark, New Jersey

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria delle Grazie a Via Trionfale

Superior of Turks and Caicos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1952 BornDetroit, MI, USA
5 Aug 197321.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Aug 197624.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Apr 197825.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Jun 197826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 Sep 199745.3AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Nov 200957.5ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Aug 201058.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
2 Aug 201058.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Obba
9 Oct 201058.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Obba
18 Oct 201260.4AppointedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
3 Dec 201260.5InstalledArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
7 Nov 201664.5AppointedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
7 Nov 201664.5AppointedSuperior of Turks and Caicos, Antilles
19 Nov 201664.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201664.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria delle Grazie a Via Trionfale
6 Jan 201764.6InstalledArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph William Tobin (VIAF: 297864098)
Joseph William Cardinal Tobin C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Newark

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,854
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2012
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2016
  • i: CB, 7 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016