Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Lorca Planes

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1949 Born
29 Jun 197525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cartagena (en España)
15 Jan 200454.2AppointedBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
6 Mar 200454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
18 Jul 200959.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Lorca Planes
Bishop José Manuel Lorca Planes (born ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspinardo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cartagena (en España).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,543
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast