Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Bernard Gnanapragasam

Bishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1948 Born
24 Apr 197425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
13 Oct 201567.4AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
28 Nov 201567.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Justin Bernard Gnanapragasam
Bishop Justin Bernard Gnanapragasam (born ) Bishop of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarampon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jaffna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2015
  • c1: CB, 17 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 20 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,676

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast