Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Frederick Kihneman

Bishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1952 Born
26 Mar 197725.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
18 Nov 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
16 Dec 201664.8AppointedBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
28 Apr 201765.1Ordained BishopBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Frederick Kihneman
Bishop Louis Frederick Kihneman (born ) Bishop of Biloxi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLafayette
Ordained PriestCathedral, Corpus Christi, Diocese of Corpus Christi, Texas
Ordained BishopNativity of the BVM, Cathedral, Biloxi, Diocese of Biloxi, Mississippi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Biloxi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2016
  • c1/od/ob/mn: CB, 16 Dec 2016
  • c2: CB, 15 Jan 2017
  • c34: CB, 20 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Apr 2017