Catholic-Hierarchy DC

James Michael Cardinal Harvey

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}

Cardinal-Deacon of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1949 BornMilwaukee, WI
29 Jun 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
7 Feb 199848.3AppointedPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
7 Feb 199848.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
19 Mar 199848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
29 Sep 200353.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Memphis
23 Nov 201263.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
24 Nov 201263.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 201263.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna
13 Jan 201363.2InstalledArchpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
26 May 201363.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna

MicroData Summary for James Michael Harvey:
Cardinal James Michael Harvey (born ) Archpriest of Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,251
  • card/ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 14 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013