Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

Dioecesis Hanciomensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Ming-Teh-kie, Hanzhong, Shaanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}
6 July 1887SplitVicariate Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Hanchung [Hanzhong]
3 December 1924ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Hanchung [Hanzhong]
Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hanchung [Hanzhong] Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung]
195019,0601,500,0001.3%9243357756ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013