Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucius Iwejuru Ugorji

Bishop of Umuahia, Nigeria

Apostolic Administrator of Ahiara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1952 Born
16 Apr 197725.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 199038.2AppointedBishop of Umuahia, Nigeria
1 Jul 199038.4Ordained BishopBishop of Umuahia, Nigeria
19 Feb 201866.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ahiara, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Lucius Iwejuru Ugorji (VIAF: 117712976)
Bishop Lucius Iwejuru Ugorji (born ) Bishop of Umuahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaze
Ordained BishopMère de Dieu, Cathedral, Umuahia, Diocese of Umuahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Umuahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,975
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018