Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Paulsamy

Bishop of Dindigul, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1951 Born
25 May 197725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruchirapalli, India
11 Apr 201664.6AppointedBishop of Dindigul, India
22 May 201664.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dindigul, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Paulsamy
Bishop Thomas Paulsamy (born ) Bishop of Dindigul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceN. Poolampatty

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dindigul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 4 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 18 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast