Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Dada Abejide Olorunmolu

Bishop of Lokoja, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1948 Born
23 Dec 197830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lokoja, Nigeria
11 Nov 200557.1AppointedBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria
11 Feb 200657.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Martin Dada Abejide Olorunmolu
Bishop Martin Dada Abejide Olorunmolu (born ) Bishop of Lokoja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOgiri-Kabba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lokoja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,056

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018