Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anders Cardinal Arborelius, O.C.D.

Bishop of Stockholm, Sweden

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

Member of the Council for the Economy


Motto: In Laudem Gloriae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1949 Born
1969²19.2Converted
1971²21.2EnteredMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
8 Dec 197728.2Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
8 Sep 197929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
17 Nov 199849.1AppointedBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
29 Dec 199849.2Ordained BishopBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
28 Jun 201767.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201767.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
6 Dec 201768.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
6 Aug 202070.8AppointedMember of the Council for the Economy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Anders Arborelius
Anders Cardinal Arborelius O.C.D.
(born )
Bishop of Stockholm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorengo, Diocese of Lugano, Switzerland
Ordained PriestMalmö, Diocese of Stockholm
Ordained BishopSaint Eriks, Cathedral, Stockholm, Diocese of Stockholm

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Stockholm.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,452
  • card: CB, 21 May 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • i: CB, 27 Nov 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025