Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Orléans

Dioecesis Aurelianensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jacques André Blaquart, Bishop
  • André Louis Fort, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3rd Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tours
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,811 (2,630 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre
  • Official Web Site: http://www.orleans.catholique.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 14 Cloitre Saint Aignan, 45057 Orleans CEDEX 1, France
  • Telephone: 2.38.78.86.00
  • Fax: 2.38.54.36.93

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Orléans (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Blois (suppressed) Diocese of Orléans
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Orléans Diocese of Blois
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Orléans (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950300,000346,91886.5%3963643269462830338ap1951
1970395,500430,50091.9%320393591,10163694310ap1971
1980455,000495,00091.9%260443041,496578460293ap1981
1990472,000566,00083.4%198342322,0341666339294ap1991
1999448,200623,60071.9%159361952,2982463231294ap2000
2000448,200617,17672.6%158341922,3342663233294ap2001
2001448,200618,12672.5%155341892,3713064237294ap2002
2002448,200618,12672.5%153341872,3962964209294ap2003
2003448,200632,55770.9%153301832,4493053223294ap2004
2004448,200632,55770.9%146301762,5463151227294ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014