Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Marciante

Bishop of Cefal¨, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1951 Born
5 Oct 198029.2Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
1 Jul 199341.9IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Jun 200957.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Jun 200957.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
11 Jul 200957.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora
16 Feb 201866.5AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
14 Apr 201866.7InstalledBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Marciante
Bishop Giuseppe Marciante (born ) Bishop of Cefal¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained PriestSan Benedetto, Church, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cefal¨.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,249
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast