Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Florianópolis

Archidioecesis Florianopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Wilson Tadeu Jönck, S.C.I., Archbishop
  • Vito Schlickmann, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 January 1927
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Santa Catarina
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 7,862 (3,036 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul IV
  • Web Site: http://www.arquifloripa.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Rua Esteves Junior 447, 88015-130 Florianopolis, SC, Brazil
  • Telephone: (048) 224-4799
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina)
19 March 1908ErectedDiocese of Curitiba Diocese of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina) (erected)
17 January 1927Territory LostDiocese of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina) Diocese of Lages (erected)
17 January 1927Territory LostDiocese of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina) Diocese of Joinville (erected)
Archdiocese of Florianópolis
17 January 1927ElevatedDiocese of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina) Archdiocese of Florianópolis
28 December 1954Territory LostArchdiocese of Florianópolis Diocese of Tubarão (erected)
23 November 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Florianópolis
Diocese of Joinville
Diocese of Rio do Sul (erected)
19 April 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Florianópolis
Diocese of Joinville
Diocese of Rio do Sul
Diocese of Blumenau (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Florianópolis
1950550,000584,00094.2%52741264,36510052058ap1951
1966420,000455,00092.3%44811253,36011054032ap1967
1970410,643465,17388.3%55671223,36518443939ap1971
1976590,061610,33496.7%52771294,5741114744943ap1977
1980600,000660,00090.9%61771384,3471916031847ap1981
1990758,000834,00090.9%71761475,1565617549353ap1991
1999973,5091,146,65384.9%91661576,2008214246062ap2000
2000910,000999,09791.1%96661625,6178214044553ap2001
2001953,9761,191,50580.1%101621635,8528615144658ap2002
2002953,3441,191,50580.0%79631426,7138620243758ap2003
2003970,3441,300,40674.6%96741705,7078835044659ap2004
2004966,4381,243,80777.7%102751775,4608823944859ap2005
20061,080,0001,385,00078.0%110751855,8379619843564ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014