Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Vázquez Villalobos

Archbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1950 Born
15 Apr 197928.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
31 Oct 201262.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México
30 Jan 201362.3Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México
10 Feb 201867.4AppointedArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
25 Apr 201867.6InstalledArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro Vázquez Villalobos
Archbishop Pedro Vázquez Villalobos (born ) Archbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuisquilco, Diocese of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco
Ordained Bishopesplanade de la agencia municipal, Puerto Escondido, Diocese of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 31 Oct 2012
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,652
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2018
  • i: CB, 22 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Aug 2018

Quantcast