Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimiro López Llorente

Bishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1950 Born
6 Apr 197524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Osma-Soria, Spain
2 Feb 200150.2AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
25 Mar 200150.3Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
25 Apr 200655.4AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain

MicroData Summary for Casimiro López Llorente
Bishop Casimiro López Llorente (born ) Bishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgo de Osma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,947

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast