Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mombasa

Archidioecesis Mombasaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Emanuel Barbara, O.F.M. Cap., Apostolic Administrator
  • John Njenga, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 May 1990
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kenya
  • Square Kilometers: 30,395 (11,740 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 84425, Nyerere Ave., Mombasa, Kenya
  • Telephone: (011)31.15.26
  • Fax: 31.32.71

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Mombasa e Zanzibar
8 May 1955ErectedArchdiocese of Nairobi Diocese of Mombasa e Zanzibar (erected)
Diocese of Mombasa
12 December 1964SplitDiocese of Mombasa e Zanzibar Diocese of Mombasa
9 December 1976Territory LostDiocese of Mombasa
Diocese of Meru
Prefecture Apostolic of Garissa (erected)
Archdiocese of Mombasa
21 May 1990ElevatedDiocese of Mombasa Archdiocese of Mombasa
2 June 2000Territory LostDiocese of Garissa
Archdiocese of Mombasa
Diocese of Malindi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mombasa
197062,646936,0006.7%547521,2044710822ap1971
198081,7901,289,0006.3%1537521,5723714731ap1981
Archdiocese of Mombasa
1990140,0001,339,00010.5%2823512,7452419138ap1991
1999167,6101,829,1909.2%3228602,79313428242ap2000
2000179,2201,632,00011.0%3627632,84413338641ap2001
2001220,0001,924,00011.4%4226683,23513239941ap2002
2002220,6501,924,50011.5%4327703,15213439241ap2003
2003197,1001,999,4059.9%4926752,62813342040ap2004
2004235,7001,804,65213.1%4327703,36713528638ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014