Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Bernard Marie Moutel

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1952 Born
20 Jun 197624.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nantes, France
11 Jun 197725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
20 Aug 201058.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
10 Oct 201058.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for Denis Bernard Marie Moutel (VIAF: 306319627)
Bishop Denis Bernard Marie Moutel (born ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncenis
Ordained DeaconSainte-Madeleine, Church, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained PriestSainte-Madeleine, Church, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained BishopSaint-Etienne, Cathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,858
  • od/c01: AJ, 30 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast