Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romulo Geolina Valles

Archbishop of Davao, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1951 Born
6 Apr 197624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tagum, Philippines
24 Jun 199745.9AppointedBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines
6 Aug 199746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines
13 Nov 200655.3AppointedArchbishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
11 Feb 201260.5AppointedArchbishop of Davao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Romulo Geolina Valles
Archbishop Romulo Geolina Valles (born ) Archbishop of Davao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaribojoc

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Davao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,139
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Feb 2017