Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Quy Nhon

Dioecesis Quinhonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Huê
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 17,087 (6,599 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://gpquinhon.org/
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, 116 Tran Hung Dao, Qui Nhon, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (056)3824.360
  • Fax: 3828.955

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}
1659ErectedDiocese of Macau Vicariate Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}
2 March 1844SplitVicariate Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}
27 August 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Quinhon
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Quinhon
Diocese of Quy Nhon
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Quinhon Diocese of Quy Nhon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Quinhon
195075,0002,750,0002.7%10515120625876766ap1951
Diocese of Quy Nhon
196996,1251,913,3725.0%6812801,20110426440ap1981
197950,1602,380,0002.1%453481,045530233ap1991
199042,5002,400,0001.8%404449651426139ap2001
200155,7513,438,0241.6%84690619927537ap2002
200261,0273,438,0241.8%69675813629737ap2003
200362,3003,500,0001.8%73679788632137ap2004
200462,5203,604,0391.7%64670893631536ap2005
201068,3553,780,7001.8%70878876819447ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014