Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Yanguas Sanz

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1947 BornAlberite de Iregua
19 Jun 197224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
23 Dec 200558.2AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
25 Feb 200658.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Yanguas Sanz:
Bishop José María Yanguas Sanz (born ) Bishop of Cuenca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cuenca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013