Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Arêas Rifan

Apostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Cedamusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1950 Born
8 Dec 197424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Jun 200251.6AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Jun 200251.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cedamusa
18 Aug 200251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cedamusa
16 Dec 200252.1SucceededApostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Arêas Rifan (VIAF: 69253250)
Bishop Fernando Arêas Rifan (born ) Apostolic Administrator of São João Maria Vianney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Fidelis, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopFundação Rural de Campos, Campos dos Goytacazes

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of São João Maria Vianney.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,239
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast