Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Odilo Pedro Cardinal Scherer

Archbishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea al Quirinale

Member of the Council for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1949 Born
7 Dec 197627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
28 Nov 200152.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Nov 200152.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Novi
2 Feb 200252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novi
9 Mar 200252.4InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
21 Mar 200757.5AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
29 Apr 200757.6InstalledArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Nov 200758.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200758.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea al Quirinale
17 Feb 200858.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea al Quirinale
6 Aug 202070.8AppointedMember of the Council for the Economy

MicroData Summary for Odilo Pedro Scherer
(VIAF: 283030994; WikiData: Q704881)
Odilo Pedro Cardinal Scherer (born ) Archbishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Francisco, Cerro Largo, Diocese of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopCristo Rei, Cathedral, Toledo, Diocese of Toledo, Parana

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,128
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 17 Feb 2024