Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crispin Ojeda Márquez

Bishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1952 Born
27 Dec 197927.7Ordained PriestPriest of Colima, México
4 Jun 201159.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
4 Jun 201159.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dumium
28 Jul 201159.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dumium
27 Jul 201866.3AppointedBishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Crispin Ojeda Márquez
Bishop Crispin Ojeda Márquez (born ) Bishop of Tehuantepec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTecomán, Diocese of Colima
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tehuantepec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2011
  • ob,c1: CB, 5 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,121
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast