Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin William Vann

Bishop of Orange in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1951 Born
30 May 198130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Illinois, USA
17 May 200554.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
12 Jul 200554.1SucceededBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
13 Jul 200554.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
21 Sep 201261.3AppointedBishop of Orange in California, USA
10 Dec 201261.5InstalledBishop of Orange in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Kevin William Vann
Bishop Kevin William Vann (born ) Bishop of Orange in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpringfield

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orange in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,942
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 22 Oct 2017