Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yousif Thomas Mirkis, O.P.

Archbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1949 BornMossoul
26 Mar 198030.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Jun 201364.0SelectedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
11 Jan 201464.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Jan 201464.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Yousif Thomas Mirkis:
Archbishop Yousif Thomas Mirkis O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Kerkūk

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kerkūk (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 11 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,074

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014