Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Raja Rao Thelegathoti, S.M.M.

Bishop of Vijayawada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1952 BornPeddautapally
31 Jan 198027.8Solemn ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
7 Jun 198028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
19 Dec 201563.7AppointedBishop of Vijayawada, India
2 Feb 201663.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vijayawada, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Raja Rao Thelegathoti
Bishop Joseph Raja Rao Thelegathoti S.M.M. (born ) Bishop of Vijayawada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vijayawada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 9 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 28 Jan 2016