Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vuthilert Haelom

Bishop of Chiang Rai, Thailand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1951 Born
3 Aug 198028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bangkok, Thailand
25 Apr 201866.3AppointedBishop of Chiang Rai, Thailand
7 Jul 201866.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiang Rai, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vuthilert Haelom
Bishop Joseph Vuthilert Haelom (born ) Bishop of Chiang Rai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamsai, Archdiocese of Bangkok
Ordained BishopRajabhat University Auditorium, Chiang Rai, Diocese of Chiang Rai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiang Rai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 May 2018
  • c34: CB, 6 Jul 2018
  • c1: CB, 7 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast