Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Jay Berg

Bishop of Pueblo, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1951 BornMiles City, MT
12 Dec 199847.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
15 May 199948.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Worth, Texas, USA
15 Jan 201462.9AppointedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
27 Feb 201463.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Jay Berg:
Bishop Stephen Jay Berg (born ) Bishop of Pueblo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pueblo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2014
  • ob/c12: CB, 15 Jan 2014
  • c34: CB, 4 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Feb 2014