Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gerard Noonan

Bishop of Orlando, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1951 BornLimerick, Ireland
23 Sep 198332.5Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
21 Jun 200554.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
21 Jun 200554.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonusta
24 Aug 200554.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonusta
23 Oct 201059.6AppointedBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
16 Dec 201059.8InstalledBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for John Gerard Noonan:
Bishop John Gerard Noonan (born ) Bishop of Orlando

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orlando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015