Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norman King’oo Wambua

Bishop of Machakos, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1952² Born
22 May 198836.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 199846.4AppointedBishop of Bungoma, Kenya
16 Aug 199846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bungoma, Kenya
23 Jun 201866.4AppointedBishop of Machakos, Kenya
25 Aug 201866.6InstalledBishop of Machakos, Kenya

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Norman King’oo Wambua
Bishop Norman King’oo Wambua (born 1952) Bishop of Machakos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKathiani
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Kanduyi Stadium, Bungoma, Diocese of Bungoma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Machakos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,371
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 126
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 25 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast