Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Karaganda

Dioecesis Karagandansis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Janusz Kaleta, Bishop
  • Jan Paweł Lenga, M.I.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Kazakhstan
13 April 1991ErectedApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan (erected)
29 September 1997Territory LostApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tadjikistan (erected)
29 September 1997Territory LostApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Mission "Sui Iuris" of Turkmenistan (erected)
29 September 1997Territory LostApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Mission "Sui Iuris" of Uzbekistan (erected)
7 July 1999Territory LostApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Apostolic Administration of Atyrau (erected)
7 July 1999Territory LostApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Apostolic Administration of Astana (erected)
7 July 1999Territory LostApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Apostolic Administration of Almaty (erected)
Diocese of Karaganda
7 July 1999ElevatedApostolic Administration of Kazakhstan Diocese of Karaganda
17 May 2003Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Karaganda (from Immediately Subject)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Karaganda
199964,3743,433,3001.9%2718451,430195264ap2000
200040,0003,433,3001.2%93123,33332310ap2001
200140,0003,433,3001.2%113142,85732211ap2002
200235,0003,430,0001.0%86142,50062513ap2003
200340,0003,433,3001.2%154192,10542513ap2004
200440,0003,433,3001.2%124162,50043013ap2005
200640,0003,456,0001.2%86142,857123217ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013