Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ignacio Arrieta Ochoa de Chinchetru

Secretary of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts

Titular Bishop of Civitate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1951 Born
23 Aug 197726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
15 Feb 200755.8AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts
12 Apr 200857.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Civitate
1 May 200857.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Civitate

MicroData Summary for Juan Ignacio Arrieta Ochoa de Chinchetru (VIAF: 29615560)
Bishop Juan Ignacio Arrieta Ochoa de Chinchetru (born ) Secretary of Legislative Texts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitoria, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,735

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast