Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Pérez Lavado

Bishop of Maturín, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1951 Born
25 Jul 198635.2Ordained PriestPriest of Maracaibo, Venezuela
9 Aug 200352.3AppointedBishop of Maturín, Venezuela
31 Oct 200352.5Ordained BishopBishop of Maturín, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Enrique Pérez Lavado
Bishop Enrique Pérez Lavado (born ) Bishop of Maturín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaibo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maturín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,478

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast