Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Piong

Bishop of Keningau, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1949 Born
27 Mar 197727.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kota Kinabalu, Malaysia
17 Dec 199243.4AppointedBishop of Keningau, Malaysia
6 May 199343.8Ordained BishopBishop of Keningau, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Piong
Bishop Cornelius Piong (born ) Bishop of Keningau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBundu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Keningau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast