Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vicente Cordoba Villota, S.J.

Bishop of Fontibón


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1951 BornQuito, Ecuador
20 Jan 196917.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 Oct 197928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 198836.5Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
30 Jun 200452.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
30 Jun 200452.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
28 Aug 200453.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
25 Nov 201160.3AppointedBishop of Fontibón, Colombia
11 Feb 201260.6InstalledBishop of Fontibón, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Vicente Cordoba Villota:
Bishop Juan Vicente Cordoba Villota S.J. (born ) Bishop of Fontibón

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fontibón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,677
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013