Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Cubillos Peña

Bishop of Zipaquirá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1949 BornBogotá
29 Nov 197425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
15 Feb 200252.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
15 Feb 200252.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
23 Mar 200252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
30 Jun 200454.6AppointedBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
14 Aug 200454.7InstalledBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Cubillos Peña:
Bishop Héctor Cubillos Peña (born ) Bishop of Zipaquirá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zipaquirá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,153
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013