Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Charles Wester

Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1950 Born
15 May 197625.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
30 Jun 199847.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
30 Jun 199847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
18 Sep 199847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
8 Jan 200756.1AppointedBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
14 Mar 200756.3InstalledBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
27 Apr 201564.4AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
4 Jun 201564.5InstalledArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for John Charles Wester
Archbishop John Charles Wester (born ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Fe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,425
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2015
  • i: CB, 27 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jun 2018

Quantcast