Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maroun Nasser Gemayel

Bishop of Notre-Dame du Liban de Paris (Maronite), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1951 Born
30 Aug 198130.6Ordained PriestPriest of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
21 Jul 201261.5AppointedBishop of Notre-Dame du Liban de Paris (Maronite), France
30 Aug 201261.6Ordained BishopBishop of Notre-Dame du Liban de Paris (Maronite), France

MicroData Summary for Maroun Nasser Gemayel
Bishop Maroun Nasser Gemayel (born ) Bishop of Notre-Dame du Liban de Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAïn-Kharroubé

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Notre-Dame du Liban de Paris (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2012
  • ob: CB, 3 Aug 2012
  • c34: CB, 30 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast