Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Joseph Farrell

Prefect of the Pontifical Council for the Laity, Family, and Life


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1947 BornDublin, Ireland
24 Dec 197831.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
1984²36.3IncardinatedPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Dec 200154.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Dec 200154.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
11 Feb 200254.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
6 Mar 200759.5AppointedBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
1 May 200759.6InstalledBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
15 Aug 201668.9AppointedPrefect of the Pontifical Council for the Laity, Family, and Life

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kevin Joseph Farrell
Bishop Kevin Joseph Farrell (born ) Prefect of Laity, Family, and Life

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for the Laity, Family, and Life.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,134
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016