Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Santarsiero Rosa, O.S.I.

Bishop of Huacho, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1951 Born
14 Jun 198029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saint Joseph
13 Jun 200150.0AppointedPrelate of Huarí, Peru
12 Aug 200150.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Huarí, Peru
4 Feb 200452.6AppointedBishop of Huacho, Peru
25 Apr 200452.8InstalledBishop of Huacho, Peru

MicroData Summary for Antonio Santarsiero Rosa
Bishop Antonio Santarsiero Rosa O.S.I. (born ) Bishop of Huacho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvigliano, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huacho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast