Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Armando Colín Cruz

Bishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1950 Born
22 Apr 198231.4Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
27 Nov 200858.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
27 Nov 200858.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
28 Feb 200958.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
16 Feb 201968.3AppointedBishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México
4 Apr 201968.4InstalledBishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Florencio Armando Colín Cruz (VIAF: 286209087)
Bishop Florencio Armando Colín Cruz (born ) Bishop of Puerto Escondido

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcambay
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puerto Escondido.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,058
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2019
  • i: AM, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Apr 2019

Quantcast