Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Salta

Archidioecesis Saltensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 April 1934
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 92,860 (35,867 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesissalta.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Espana 596, A4400ANI Salta, Argentina
  • Telephone: (0387)4214-306
  • Fax: 4213-101

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Salta
28 March 1806ErectedDiocese of Córdoba (Tucumán) Diocese of Salta (erected)
15 February 1897Territory LostDiocese of Salta Diocese of Tucumán (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Salta Diocese of Jujuy (erected)
Archdiocese of Salta
20 April 1934ElevatedDiocese of Salta Archdiocese of Salta
10 April 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Salta Diocese of Orán (erected)
8 September 1969Territory LostDiocese of Catamarca
Archdiocese of Salta
Territorial Prelature of Cafayate (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Salta
1950290,000300,00096.7%42821242,3389614529ap1951
1964350,000.0%4563108011230ap1967
1970320,000376,00085.1%44701142,8078111533ap1971
1976307,722364,68084.4%40601003,077708037ap1977
1980355,000417,00085.1%3540754,7331439135ap1981
1990645,200715,00090.2%5232847,68084810540ap1991
1999687,000791,00086.9%81281096,3027728449ap2000
2000685,513791,00086.7%83331165,9097828750ap2001
2001690,428800,00086.3%73341076,4526788552ap2002
2002677,678752,97690.0%72341066,3936617452ap2003
2003677,678752,97690.0%77341116,1056717852ap2004
2004677,678752,97690.0%79341135,9976637853ap2005
2010717,000797,00090.0%90481385,19578616657ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Apr 2013