Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Espinosa Contreras

Bishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1949 BornTepic
14 Jul 197323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tepic, Nayarit, México
2 Apr 199646.4AppointedBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
11 May 199646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
3 Mar 200555.3AppointedBishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Mario Espinosa Contreras:
Bishop Mario Espinosa Contreras (born ) Bishop of Mazatlán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mazatlán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,751
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013