Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidel León Cadavid Marin

Bishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1951 Born
5 Oct 197625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
18 Jun 198836.9IncardinatedPriest of Caldas, Colombia
25 Jul 200150.0AppointedBishop of Quibdó, Colombia
22 Sep 200150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Quibdó, Colombia
2 Feb 201159.5AppointedBishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fidel León Cadavid Marin
Bishop Fidel León Cadavid Marin (born ) Bishop of Sonsón-Rionegro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntioquia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sonsón-Rionegro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,053
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Mar 2018