Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul McAleenan

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Mercia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1951 Born
8 Jun 198533.8Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 201564.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 201564.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mercia
25 Jan 201664.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mercia

MicroData Summary for Paul McAleenan
Bishop Paul McAleenan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelfast, County Antrim, Northern Ireland, Diocese of Down and Connor, Ireland
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Westminster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Nov 2015
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,801
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast