Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alan Williams, S.M.

Bishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1951 Born
8 Sep 197625.4Solemn VowsMember of Society of Mary
30 Apr 198332.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
14 Apr 201463.0AppointedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
1 Jul 201463.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Alan Williams (VIAF: 85242355)
Bishop Alan Williams S.M. (born ) Bishop of Brentwood

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOldham, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. Anne, Church, Whitechapel, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSts. Mary and Helen, Cathedral, Brentwood, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brentwood.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2014
  • ob/bp: CB, 14 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jun 2014
  • c34: CB, 26 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,197
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ob.loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018
  • op.loc: CL, 20 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast