Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samir Nassar

Archbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1950 Born
17 Aug 198030.1Ordained PriestPriest of Damas (Maronite), Syria
10 Jun 200655.9SelectedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
14 Oct 200656.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
26 Nov 200656.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for Samir Nassar
Archbishop Samir Nassar (born ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNebay

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Damas (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast