Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Hiroaki Nakano

Bishop of Kagoshima, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1951 Born
2 Apr 197826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kagoshima, Japan
7 Jul 201867.2AppointedBishop of Kagoshima, Japan
8 Oct 201867.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kagoshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Hiroaki Nakano
Bishop Francis Xavier Hiroaki Nakano (born ) Bishop of Kagoshima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKagoshima, Diocese of Kagoshima
Ordained BishopBaoshan Hall, Kagoshima, Diocese of Kagoshima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kagoshima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 17 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 8 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast