Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pelotas

Archidioecesis Pelotensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jacinto Bergmann, Archbishop
  • Jayme Henrique Chemello, Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 April 2011
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio Grande do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 20,737 (8,009 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul III
  • Web Site: http://diocese.pelotas.tche.br/
  • Mailing Address: Praca Jose Bonifacio 104, C.P. 260, 96015-170 Pelotas, RS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (053) 225-8055
  • Fax: 222-5109

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Pelotas
15 August 1910ErectedDiocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul Diocese of Pelotas (erected)
25 June 1960Territory LostDiocese of Pelotas
Diocese of Uruguaiana
Diocese of Bagé (erected)
27 May 1971Territory LostDiocese of Pelotas Diocese of Rio Grande (erected)
Archdiocese of Pelotas
13 April 2011ElevatedDiocese of Pelotas Archdiocese of Pelotas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pelotas
1949400,000472,16084.7%2635616,5578951819ap1951
1966530,000640,90082.7%4816648,2814044927ap1967
1970690,000.0%472269016144430ap1971
1976345,355406,30985.0%2911408,6331625018ap1977
1980311,000480,00064.8%3214466,7602724720ap1981
1990377,000580,00065.0%3212448,5683520225ap1991
1999302,000524,00057.6%4012525,80732914825ap2000
2000305,000530,00057.5%4012525,86532914825ap2001
2001295,061511,50557.7%3912515,78532714825ap2002
2002295,061511,50557.7%3914535,56732416525ap2003
2003315,000543,73257.9%3615516,17682613425ap2004
2004315,000543,73257.9%3514496,428132814025ap2005
Archdiocese of Pelotas

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013