Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ibadan

Archidioecesis Ibadanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 7,000 (2,703 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archdioceseofibadan.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.M.B. 5057, 8 Bale Latosa Rd., Onireke, Ibadan, Oyo State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (02)241.35.44
  • Fax: 241.48.55

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ibadan
13 March 1952ErectedArchdiocese of Lagos Prefecture Apostolic of Ibadan (erected)
Diocese of Ibadan
28 April 1958ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ibadan Diocese of Ibadan
Archdiocese of Ibadan
26 March 1994ElevatedDiocese of Ibadan Archdiocese of Ibadan

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ibadan
197050,0002,684,1451.9%543481,041484412ap1971
198055,0002,500,0002.2%1328411,3415147ap1981
199080,0003,431,0002.3%2931601,3331207324ap1991
Archdiocese of Ibadan
1999135,5004,002,5003.4%2351741,8313453624ap2000
2000255,0004,003,0006.4%2654803,1872493624ap2001
2001285,0004,450,0006.4%3648843,3922669524ap2002
2002322,4504,350,0007.4%3363963,3582578524ap2003
2003330,7504,386,7007.5%38751132,9263949524ap2004
2004348,6504,421,4307.9%391091482,35546711624ap2005
2006352,6804,641,2607.6%461401861,89663023425ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Jun 2014